AL HB492 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Birmingham, Retirement and Relief System, investments are fixed income securities, Act 556, 1959 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Birmingham, Retirement and Relief System, investments are fixed income securities, Act 556, 1959 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 57 Abs: 14) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-370.
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-03HouseEnrolled
2015-06-03HousePassed Second House
2015-06-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1380
2015-06-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-06-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-19SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 788
2015-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-04-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback