AL HB492 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Twenty-fifth Judicial Circuit, (Marion and Winston Counties), public defender office, funding, Act 720, 1978 Reg. Sess. repealed
Title
Twenty-fifth Judicial Circuit, (Marion and Winston Counties), public defender office, funding, Act 720, 1978 Reg. Sess. repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-576. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 901 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 786 | |
2011-05-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |