AL HB491 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
Pending: Senate Healthcare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
Pending: Senate Healthcare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion, physicians, duty of care owed to babies born alive after faild abortion, criminal penalties, definitions further provided
Title
Abortion, physicians, duty of care owed to babies born alive after faild abortion, criminal penalties, definitions further provided
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 65 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 65 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |
2019-05-21 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-21 | House | Givan intended to vote "Nay" |
2019-05-21 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 843 |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 842 |
2019-05-21 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 841 |
2019-05-21 | House | Shaver first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |