AL HB491 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Collinsville, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, governing body may permit
Title
Collinsville, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, governing body may permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 72 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 72 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1124 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 795 |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |