AL HB490 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Coosa Co., Forever Wild Land, payment from Ala. Trust Fund for lost ad valorem tax revenue, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coosa Co., Forever Wild Land, payment from Ala. Trust Fund for lost ad valorem tax revenue, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateFurther Consideration
2017-05-19SenateChambliss motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2017-05-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2017-04-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 514
2017-04-18HouseResolution of Local Application Offered
2017-04-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 513
2017-04-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-04-13HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback