AL HB490 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:51 a.m. on May 26, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:51 a.m. on May 26, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lawrence Co., sheriff, authorized to provide retiring officer with badge and pistol, retroactive effect
Title
Lawrence Co., sheriff, authorized to provide retiring officer with badge and pistol, retroactive effect
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor at 10:51 a.m. on May 26, 2011. | |
2011-05-26 | Assigned Act No. 2011-321 on 06/02/2011. | |
2011-05-26 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-05-26 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 766 | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 309 | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |