AL HB49 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Environment, Alabama Drought Assessment and Planning Team established within Economic and Community Affairs Department, power and duties, the Monitoring and Impacts Group Subcommittee established, membership, duties, responsibilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment, Alabama Drought Assessment and Planning Team established within Economic and Community Affairs Department, power and duties, the Monitoring and Impacts Group Subcommittee established, membership, duties, responsibilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Boothe motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-400.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2014-04-03HouseBoothe motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1105
2014-04-03HouseConcurrence Requested
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1177
2014-04-03SenateBeasley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1176
2014-04-03SenateAgriculture, Conservation, and Forestry Amendment Offered
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-03-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-03-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
2014-03-05HouseEngrossed
2014-03-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 539
2014-03-05HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 538
2014-03-05HouseAgriculture and Forestry first Substitute Offered
2014-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-01-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2014-01-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB49
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB49-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB49-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB49-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=491241&VOTE=538&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=491242&VOTE=539&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500393&VOTE=1176&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500394&VOTE=1177&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500566&VOTE=1105&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback