AL HB487 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Colbert Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colbert Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
2018-03-22HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-476.
2018-03-22HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-22SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-22HouseEnrolled
2018-03-22HousePassed Second House
2018-03-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1015
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 701
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback