AL HB486 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Affairs Dept., board member eligibility updated, definitions, rename service manager as veteran service officer and district service commissioner as district manager, appointment of an executive director to oversee operation of state veterans homes, provided, Sec. 31-5-12 repealed; Secs. 31-5-1 to 31-5-11, inclusive, 31-5-13, 31-5-14, 31-5A-1 to 31-5A-11, inclusive, am'd.
Title
Veterans Affairs Dept., board member eligibility updated, definitions, rename service manager as veteran service officer and district service commissioner as district manager, appointment of an executive director to oversee operation of state veterans homes, provided, Sec. 31-5-12 repealed; Secs. 31-5-1 to 31-5-11, inclusive, 31-5-13, 31-5-14, 31-5A-1 to 31-5A-11, inclusive, am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 774 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Reynolds motion to Adopt Roll Call 773 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Reynolds motion to Adopt Roll Call 773 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 774 |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 12 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5A | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |