AL HB485 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2017 at 4:47 p.m. on May 16, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2017 at 4:47 p.m. on May 16, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tallapoosa Co., Union Volunteer Fire and Rescue District, fire protection service fees, levy, expenditure for fire protection and local volunteer fire dept., referendum
Title
Tallapoosa Co., Union Volunteer Fire and Rescue District, fire protection service fees, levy, expenditure for fire protection and local volunteer fire dept., referendum
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2017 at 4:47 p.m. on May 16, 2017. |
2017-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-327. |
2017-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-16 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1071 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 656 |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |