AL HB481 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Shelby Co., county roads in subdivisions in unincorporated areas of county, speed limits, altering by co. commission
Title
Shelby Co., county roads in subdivisions in unincorporated areas of county, speed limits, altering by co. commission
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-360. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1124 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 954 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 588 |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation |