AL HB480 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:43 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:43 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tuscaloosa Co., sales and use taxes, collection clarified, retroactive to Mar. 1, 2020, Act No. 56, 1953 Regular Session, as amended by Act No. 94-554, 1994 Regular Session, Act No. 96-554, 1996 Regular Session, and Act No. 2015-202, 2015 Regular Session, am'd.
Title
Tuscaloosa Co., sales and use taxes, collection clarified, retroactive to Mar. 1, 2020, Act No. 56, 1953 Regular Session, as amended by Act No. 94-554, 1994 Regular Session, Act No. 96-554, 1996 Regular Session, and Act No. 2015-202, 2015 Regular Session, am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle South [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:43 p.m. on May 9, 2020. |
2020-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-187. |
2020-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 651 |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 447 |
2020-05-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation |