AL HB48 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Funeral Service Board, licensure and regulation of funeral establishments, funeral directors, and embalmers further provided for, board members, compensation, Funeral Bd. Property Acquisition Fund estab., rules re sales by licensees auth., violations subject to disciplinary action, general liability policy required, apprenticeships further provided for, Secs. 34-13-1, 34-13-2, 34-13-4, 34-13-7, 34-13-9, 34-13-11, 34-13-12, 34-13-23, 34-13-24, 34-13-26, 34-13-27, 34-13-52, 34-13-53, 34-13-54, 34-13-55, 34-13-56, 34-13-56.1, 34-13-72, 34-13-73, 34-13-92, 34-13-94, 34-13-113, 34-13-130, 34-13-131, 34-13-132, 34-13-134 am'd.
Title
Funeral Service Board, licensure and regulation of funeral establishments, funeral directors, and embalmers further provided for, board members, compensation, Funeral Bd. Property Acquisition Fund estab., rules re sales by licensees auth., violations subject to disciplinary action, general liability policy required, apprenticeships further provided for, Secs. 34-13-1, 34-13-2, 34-13-4, 34-13-7, 34-13-9, 34-13-11, 34-13-12, 34-13-23, 34-13-24, 34-13-26, 34-13-27, 34-13-52, 34-13-53, 34-13-54, 34-13-55, 34-13-56, 34-13-56.1, 34-13-72, 34-13-73, 34-13-92, 34-13-94, 34-13-113, 34-13-130, 34-13-131, 34-13-132, 34-13-134 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. K.L. Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1073 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 414 (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 413 (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - HBIR: Brown (K) motion to Adopt Roll Call 412 (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 414 (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 413 (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - HBIR: Brown (K) motion to Adopt Roll Call 412 (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-339. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1073 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Figures motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2022-03-02 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-02 | House | Oliver intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 414 |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 413 |
2022-03-02 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 13 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 134 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 56.1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 13 | 94 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |