AL HB48 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Parental rights, provide that a conviction of a parent for rape or incest is a ground for termination of parental rights if the rape or incest resulted in the conception of the child, Secs. 12-15-312, 12-15-319 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental rights, provide that a conviction of a parent for rape or incest is a ground for termination of parental rights if the rape or incest resulted in the conception of the child, Secs. 12-15-312, 12-15-319 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - House - Dismukes motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
2019-05-29HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-512.
2019-05-29HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-29SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-29SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-28HouseEnrolled
2019-05-28HouseDismukes motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1099
2019-05-28HouseConcurrence Requested
2019-05-28SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1209
2019-05-28SenateChambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1208
2019-05-28SenateJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2019-05-28SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-05-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2019-05-07HouseEngrossed
2019-05-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 545
2019-05-07HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 544
2019-05-07HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2019-05-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB48&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB48-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB48-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB48-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198182-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201145-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=616274&VOTE=544&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=616345&VOTE=545&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=624513&VOTE=1208&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=624514&VOTE=1209&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=624776&VOTE=1099&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback