AL HB48 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Government Health Insurance Program, Care Assurance System for the Aging and Homebound authorized to participate, Sec. 11-91A-2 am'd.
Title
Local Government Health Insurance Program, Care Assurance System for the Aging and Homebound authorized to participate, Sec. 11-91A-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 72 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Lee motion to Table (Y: 23 N: 55 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 72 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Lee motion to Table (Y: 23 N: 55 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-15 | House | Insurance first Amendment Offered |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-124. |
2018-02-15 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:08 a.m. on February 15, 2018. |
2018-02-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 387 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reed motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2018-01-25 | House | Engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Rowe intended to vote "Yea" |
2018-01-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 106 |
2018-01-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 105 |
2018-01-25 | House | Lee motion to Table lost Roll Call 104 |
2018-01-25 | House | Insurance 1st Amendment Offered |
2018-01-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |