AL HB48 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 7:28 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adoptions, income tax credit authorized for private intrastate adoption or adoption of qualified foster child

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoptions, income tax credit authorized for private intrastate adoption or adoption of qualified foster child

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-07 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-06 - House - Lee motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:28 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-413.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HouseSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2014-04-03SenateBrewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1237
2014-04-03SenateHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2014-04-03HouseLee motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1103
2014-04-03HouseExecutive Amendment Offered
2014-04-03HouseForwarded to Governor
2014-04-01HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-01HouseEnrolled
2014-04-01SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-01HousePassed Second House
2014-04-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1084
2014-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-02-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2014-01-22HouseCosponsors intended to be added
2014-01-22HouseSanderford intended to vote "Yea"
2014-01-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 46
2014-01-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-01-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB48
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB48-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB48-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=480307&VOTE=46&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=480310&VOTE=47&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=498504&VOTE=1084&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500441&VOTE=1103&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500755&VOTE=1237&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback