AL HB478 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on March 30, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on March 30, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Blount Co., sheriff, authorized to conduct fund raising events
Title
Blount Co., sheriff, authorized to conduct fund raising events
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 782 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 781 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 589 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - House - HBIR: Shedd motion to Adopt Roll Call 588 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 781 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 589 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - House - HBIR: Shedd motion to Adopt Roll Call 588 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on March 30, 2022. |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-253. |
2022-03-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-30 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 782 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 589 |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |