AL HB478 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wilcox Co., sheriff, qualifications, continuing education required
Title
Wilcox Co., sheriff, qualifications, continuing education required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-285. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1036 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Sanders motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Sanders motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 534 |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |