AL HB478 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended adopted Roll Call 1496
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended adopted Roll Call 1496
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Driving under the influence, crime further defined, term "under the influence" defined, Sec. 32-5A-191 am'd (2012-20536)
Title
Driving under the influence, crime further defined, term "under the influence" defined, Sec. 32-5A-191 am'd (2012-20536)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Fielding motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Holmes motion to Adjourn (Y: 16 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Fielding motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Holmes motion to Adjourn (Y: 16 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended adopted Roll Call 1496 | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1495 | |
2012-05-16 | Bedford Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Fielding motion to reconsider third reading vote, adopted. | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1473 | |
2012-05-16 | Fielding motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1472 | |
2012-05-16 | Fielding Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 741 | |
2012-04-12 | Holmes motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 740 | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 739 | |
2012-04-12 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-03-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |