AL HB478 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 39-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Economic development, tax incentives authorized to certain companies and educational institutions for locating new or expanding business in state, or a retention project, capital investment and job requirements, Alabama Development Office and Revenue Department to recommend to Governor, Industrial Development Authority to approve project for incentive (2011-20902)
Title
Economic development, tax incentives authorized to certain companies and educational institutions for locating new or expanding business in state, or a retention project, capital investment and job requirements, Alabama Development Office and Revenue Department to recommend to Governor, Industrial Development Authority to approve project for incentive (2011-20902)
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Richard Baughn [R] | Rep. Alan Boothe [R] |
Rep. Harry Bridges [R] | Rep. K.L. Brown [R] | Rep. Mac Buttram [R] | Rep. Gregory Canfield [R] |
Sen. Donnie Chesteen [R] | Rep. Steve Clouse [R] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Rep. Randy Davis [R] |
Rep. Joe Faust [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] | Rep. Blaine Galliher [R] | Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Rep. Micky Hammon [R] | Rep. Alan Harper [R] | Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Joseph Hubbard [D] |
Rep. James Ison [R] | Rep. Ken Johnson [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. Richard Laird [D] |
Rep. Paul Lee [R] | Rep. Wes Long [R] | Rep. Jay Love [R] | Rep. Barry Mask [R] |
Rep. John Merrill [R] | Rep. Mike Millican [R] | Rep. Barry Moore [R] | Rep. Becky Nordgren [R] |
Rep. William Poole [R] | Rep. Kerry Rich [R] | Rep. William Roberts [R] | Rep. Roderick Scott [D] |
Rep. Harry Shiver [R] | Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] | Rep. Lesley Vance [R] | Sen. April Weaver [R] |
Rep. Phil Williams [R] | Rep. Gregory Wren [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Mask motion to Table (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Mask motion to Table (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability | |
2011-05-04 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-04 | Cosponsors Added | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 642 | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 641 | |
2011-05-04 | Mask first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-04 | Economic Development and Tourism first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-04 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-04-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |