AL HB477 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, driving under influence, Public Safety Department, suspension period if person has 0.15 percent or more of alcohol, Sec. 32-5A-304 am'd
Title
Motor vehicles, driving under influence, Public Safety Department, suspension period if person has 0.15 percent or more of alcohol, Sec. 32-5A-304 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-05-01 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1103 | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1102 | |
2012-05-01 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-03-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |