AL HB476 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p. m. on April 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p. m. on April 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marshall Co., Tennessee Valley Authority, additional payments in lieu of taxes, portion distrib. to local boards of education
Title
Marshall Co., Tennessee Valley Authority, additional payments in lieu of taxes, portion distrib. to local boards of education
Sponsors
Rep. Wes Long [R] | Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 45) [FAIL]
2012-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 45) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p. m. on April 10, 2012. | |
2012-04-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-206 on 04/17/2012. | |
2012-04-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 509 | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-03-20 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 387 | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |