AL HB471 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Montgomery and Montgomery Airport Authority, authorized to join Employees' Retirement System of Alabama and transfer assets and liabilities from existing Employees' Retirement System of the City of Montgomery under certain conditions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Montgomery and Montgomery Airport Authority, authorized to join Employees' Retirement System of Alabama and transfer assets and liabilities from existing Employees' Retirement System of the City of Montgomery under certain conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 25) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
2018-03-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-559.
2018-03-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-27SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-22HouseEnrolled
2018-03-22HousePassed Second House
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1111
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2018-03-13HouseEngrossed
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 693
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 692
2018-03-13HouseMontgomery County Legislation Amendment Offered
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-03-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB471&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB471-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB471-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191956-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594851&VOTE=692&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594852&VOTE=693&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600447&VOTE=1111&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback