AL HB470 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Delivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Delivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Autauga Co., real property sales, transfer of duties from judge of probate to revenue commissioner
Title
Autauga Co., real property sales, transfer of duties from judge of probate to revenue commissioner
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2016-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016. |
2016-04-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-250. |
2016-04-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2016-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 831 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 514 |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |