AL HB47 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:54 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms, pistols, sale of or delivery to minor, record-keeping and administrative requirements, certain provisions eliminated, Secs. 13A-11-57, 13A-11-61.2, 13A-11-72, 13A-11-76, 13A-11-79, 22-52-10.8, 40-12-143 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms, pistols, sale of or delivery to minor, record-keeping and administrative requirements, certain provisions eliminated, Secs. 13A-11-57, 13A-11-61.2, 13A-11-72, 13A-11-76, 13A-11-79, 22-52-10.8, 40-12-143 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - House - England motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - England motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:54 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-341.
2015-06-04SenateGovernmental Affairs first Substitute Offered
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04HouseEnrolled
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-04SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-06-04HouseTuggle intended to vote "Nay"
2015-06-04HouseEngland motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1295
2015-06-04HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-06-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1450
2015-06-04SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1449
2015-06-04SenateSingleton second Substitute Offered
2015-06-04SenateSingleton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-06-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-06-04SenateSingleton first Substitute Offered
2015-06-04SenateSingleton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-06-04SenateSingleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-06-04SenateSingleton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-06-04SenateGovernmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2015-06-04SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-05-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2015-05-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2015-05-12HouseEngrossed
2015-05-12HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 700
2015-05-12HouseEngland motion to Table adopted Roll Call 699
2015-05-12HouseBracy Amendment Offered
2015-05-12HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 698
2015-05-12HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered
2015-05-12HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-04-30HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-03-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB47
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB47-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB47-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB47-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=517470&VOTE=698&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=517484&VOTE=699&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=517485&VOTE=700&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526271&VOTE=1449&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526272&VOTE=1450&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526403&VOTE=1295&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback