AL HB47 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Property, tax sales, distrib. of excess funds to owner of property, includes holder of records, Sec. 40-10-28 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property, tax sales, distrib. of excess funds to owner of property, includes holder of records, Sec. 40-10-28 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Fielding motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-370.
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2013-05-20HouseClouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1242
2013-05-20HouseConcurrence Requested
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1098
2013-05-20SenateFielding motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1097
2013-05-20SenateFielding Amendment Offered
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-04-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-26SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2013-02-26HouseEngrossed
2013-02-26HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 153
2013-02-26HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 152
2013-02-26HouseFinancial Services Amendment Offered
2013-02-26HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-02-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-02-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB47
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB47-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB47-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=458410&VOTE=152&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=458414&VOTE=153&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476017&VOTE=1097&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476018&VOTE=1098&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476330&VOTE=1242&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback