AL HB468 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Opelika, corp. limits alt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opelika, corp. limits alt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 35) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-09SenateFurther Consideration
2020-05-09SenateChambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2020-05-09SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2020-05-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-05-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2020-05-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 394
2020-05-05HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-05-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-05-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Lee County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback