AL HB467 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Delivered to Governor at 2:58 p.m. on May 18, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

DeKalb Co., real property filing and recording fee, distrib for mental health professional for CED Mental Health in co. and to sheriff's office for school resource officers, Sec. 45-25-250.17 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DeKalb Co., real property filing and recording fee, distrib for mental health professional for CED Mental Health in co. and to sheriff's office for school resource officers, Sec. 45-25-250.17 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 22 Abs: 35) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:58 p.m. on May 18, 2020.
2020-05-18HouseClerk of the House Certification
2020-05-18SenateSignature Requested
2020-05-18HouseEnrolled
2020-05-18HousePassed Second House
2020-05-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 730
2020-05-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-05-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-05-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2020-05-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 556
2020-05-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-05-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-05-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback