AL HB467 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Committee on County and Municipal Government per Rule 50(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Committee on County and Municipal Government per Rule 50(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Shelby Co, privately owned sewer systems that use public rights-of-way of public roads, req'd to be certified and regulated by PSC, const. amend.
Title
Shelby Co, privately owned sewer systems that use public rights-of-way of public roads, req'd to be certified and regulated by PSC, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 24 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Local Application Roll Call 858 (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 31 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Local Application Roll Call 858 (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 31 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on County and Municipal Government per Rule 50(b) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the second time |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Shelby County |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 857 |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Local Application Roll Call 858 |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-01 | House | Rereferred from Calendar to TU&I |
2018-03-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation |