AL HB467 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p. m. on April 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p. m. on April 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gaylesville, corp. limits alt.
Title
Gaylesville, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p. m. on April 10, 2012. | |
2012-04-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-205 on 04/17/2012. | |
2012-04-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 507 | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 240 | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |