AL HB466 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bail Bond Regulatory Act, qualifications of Professional Bail Bonding Board and fees revised, temporary licenses provided, Secs. 15-13-201, 15-13-202, 15-13-203, 15-13-206, 15-13-207, 15-13-209, 15-13-210, 15-13-211, 15-13-214, 15-13-217 am'd.
Title
Bail Bond Regulatory Act, qualifications of Professional Bail Bonding Board and fees revised, temporary licenses provided, Secs. 15-13-201, 15-13-202, 15-13-203, 15-13-206, 15-13-207, 15-13-209, 15-13-210, 15-13-211, 15-13-214, 15-13-217 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-03-11 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions first Amendment Offered |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
Same As/Similar To
SB204 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-499.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 13 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 13 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 13 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 13 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 13 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 13 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 13 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 13 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 13 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 13 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |