AL HB464 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2017 at 4:47 p.m. on May 16, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2017 at 4:47 p.m. on May 16, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., judge of probate, special recording fee, collection of further authorized, Sec. 45-2-83.21 am'd.
Title
Baldwin Co., judge of probate, special recording fee, collection of further authorized, Sec. 45-2-83.21 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 71 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 71 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2017 at 4:47 p.m. on May 16, 2017. |
2017-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-326. |
2017-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-16 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1069 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 588 |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |