AL HB463 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Coosa Co., Forever Wild Land Trust property, certain percentage of available on a marketplace for carbon credits, any income received to be credited to General Fund of Coosa Co., const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coosa Co., Forever Wild Land Trust property, certain percentage of available on a marketplace for carbon credits, any income received to be credited to General Fund of Coosa Co., const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - House - Local Application Roll Call 777 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 776 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Robbins motion to Adopt Roll Call 775 (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-07SenateFurther Consideration
2022-04-07SenateChambliss motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2022-04-07SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2022-04-07SenateSingleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2022-04-07SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2022-04-07SenateSingleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2022-04-07SenateAgriculture, Conservation and Forestry Amendment Offered
2022-03-31SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2022-04-07SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2022-03-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
2022-03-30HouseLocal Application adopted Roll Call 777
2022-03-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 776
2022-03-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2022-03-29HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-03-29HouseRereferred from Calendar to LL
2022-03-17HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-03-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB463&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/HB463-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/219631-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-44180.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-44397.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-44400.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=685607&VOTE=775&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB463&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=685613&VOTE=776&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=685617&VOTE=777&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback