AL HB460 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:32 p.m. on March 4, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:32 p.m. on March 4, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Co., judge of probate, motor vehicles, one-stop tag purchase, certain duties of revenue commissioner transferred to, license renewal by mail, distrib. of fees
Title
Washington Co., judge of probate, motor vehicles, one-stop tag purchase, certain duties of revenue commissioner transferred to, license renewal by mail, distrib. of fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 4:32 p.m. on March 4, 2014. |
2014-03-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-148. |
2014-03-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 633 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bedford motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-02-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 306 |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |