AL HB460 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Reported from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections as Favorable
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Reported from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections as Favorable
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Voter registration list, notice provided to all persons whose names are purged from list, Sec. 17-4-3 am'd.
Title
Voter registration list, notice provided to all persons whose names are purged from list, Sec. 17-4-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections as Favorable |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 909 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 908 |
2013-04-25 | House | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |