AL HB460 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance, title insurance agents, qualifications and procedures for licensing, written examination, continuing education requirements, Commissioner of Insurance promulgate rules, exceptions, Secs. 27-25-3, 27-25-4 am'd; Secs. 27-25-4.1, 27-25-4.2, 27-25-4.3, 27-25-4.4, 27-25-4.5, 27-25-4.6, 27-25-4.7, 27-25-4.8 added
Title
Insurance, title insurance agents, qualifications and procedures for licensing, written examination, continuing education requirements, Commissioner of Insurance promulgate rules, exceptions, Secs. 27-25-3, 27-25-4 am'd; Secs. 27-25-4.1, 27-25-4.2, 27-25-4.3, 27-25-4.4, 27-25-4.5, 27-25-4.6, 27-25-4.7, 27-25-4.8 added
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012. | |
2012-05-09 | Assigned Act No. 2012-397. | |
2012-05-09 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-09 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1160 | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 727 | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |