AL HB46 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Tax preparers, required to provide federal identification number on Alabama income tax returns, buisness privilege tax return date made the same for state and federal returns, the maximum business privilege tax amount for a Real Estate Investment Trust (REIT); the name of the Taxpayer Advocate changed to the Taxpayer Assistance Officer, and allows for multiple Taxpayer Assistance Officers, Alabama Taxpayer Protection and Assistance Act, Secs. 40-14A-22, 40-14A-25 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax preparers, required to provide federal identification number on Alabama income tax returns, buisness privilege tax return date made the same for state and federal returns, the maximum business privilege tax amount for a Real Estate Investment Trust (REIT); the name of the Taxpayer Advocate changed to the Taxpayer Assistance Officer, and allows for multiple Taxpayer Assistance Officers, Alabama Taxpayer Protection and Assistance Act, Secs. 40-14A-22, 40-14A-25 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseForwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
2017-05-17HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-363.
2017-05-17HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-17HouseEnrolled
2017-05-17SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-17HousePassed Second House
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1140
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2017-04-04HouseEngrossed
2017-04-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 393
2017-04-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 392
2017-04-04HouseScott first Substitute Offered
2017-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback