AL HB459 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Polygraph Examiners Board, fees increased for application, original license, and license renewal, Sec. 34-25-26 am'd.
Title
Polygraph Examiners Board, fees increased for application, original license, and license renewal, Sec. 34-25-26 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Whitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-408. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1196 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2019-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 432 |
2019-04-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |