AL HB458 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Blount Co., court reporters, compensation, expiration of salary supplements of the Forty-first Judicial Circuit court reporters, Act 909, 1971 Reg. Sess., and Act 2000-440, 2000 Reg. Sess., repealed
Title
Blount Co., court reporters, compensation, expiration of salary supplements of the Forty-first Judicial Circuit court reporters, Act 909, 1971 Reg. Sess., and Act 2000-440, 2000 Reg. Sess., repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 80 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 465 |
2017-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |