AL HB455 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Economic development, tax increment district, 21st Century Manufacturing Zone, authority to form extended to counties, Secs. 11-99-1, 11-99-2 am'd.; Act 2013-51, 2013 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development, tax increment district, 21st Century Manufacturing Zone, authority to form extended to counties, Secs. 11-99-1, 11-99-2 am'd.; Act 2013-51, 2013 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - House - Davis motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-424.
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2013-05-20HouseDavis motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1265
2013-05-20HouseConcurrence Requested
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1133
2013-05-20SenateFigures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1132
2013-05-20SenateFinance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-05-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2013-05-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2013-04-24HouseEngrossed
2013-04-24HouseCosponsors Added
2013-04-24HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 780
2013-04-24HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 779
2013-04-24HouseCounty and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
2013-04-24HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-04-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-03-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB455
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB455-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB455-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB455-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=469163&VOTE=779&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=469169&VOTE=780&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=469174&VOTE=781&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476151&VOTE=1132&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476152&VOTE=1133&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476677&VOTE=1265&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback