AL HB455 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 7:30 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 7:30 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education, local superintendent of education, time period for filling position extended, appointment of interim superintendent provided for, Secs. 16-9-11, 16-12-1 am'd.; Act 2010-210, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Education, local superintendent of education, time period for filling position extended, appointment of interim superintendent provided for, Secs. 16-9-11, 16-12-1 am'd.; Act 2010-210, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 7:30 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-573. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1010 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2011-04-28 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554 | |
2011-04-28 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-28 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 553 | |
2011-04-28 | Education Policy Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-28 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |