AL HB454 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., prohibit a person from owning or operating or installing, creating, building, or fabricating a secret compartment to conceal contraband, const. amend.
Title
Baldwin Co., prohibit a person from owning or operating or installing, creating, building, or fabricating a secret compartment to conceal contraband, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Local Application pending Roll Call 711 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Local Application pending Roll Call 711 |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 710 |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 709 |
2018-03-13 | House | Baldwin County Legislation Amendment Offered |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |