AL HB450 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Warranties, New Assistive Devices Warranty Act, remedies
Title
Warranties, New Assistive Devices Warranty Act, remedies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 831 | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 830 | |
2012-04-17 | Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |