AL HB450 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 5:10 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 5:10 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms, soliciting or encouraging a licensed dealer or private seller of firearms or ammunition to transfer a firearm or ammunition if the person knows the transfer violates state and federal law and providing false information to dealer or seller of firearms or ammunition with intent to deceive, crimes established, exceptions, penalties
Title
Firearms, soliciting or encouraging a licensed dealer or private seller of firearms or ammunition to transfer a firearm or ammunition if the person knows the transfer violates state and federal law and providing false information to dealer or seller of firearms or ammunition with intent to deceive, crimes established, exceptions, penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Galliher [R] | Rep. Todd Greeson [R] | Rep. Mike Hill [R] | Rep. Stephen Hurst [R] |
Rep. Ronald Johnson [R] | Rep. Johnny Morrow [D] | Rep. Jeremy Oden [R] | Rep. Elwyn Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 5:10 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-570. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 959 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 710 | |
2011-05-05 | Wren motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 709 | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |