AL HB450 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human Resources Department, child care facilities, drop-in child care center defined, Sec. 38-7-2 am'd.
Title
Human Resources Department, child care facilities, drop-in child care center defined, Sec. 38-7-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources | |
2010-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1035 | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Hall motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Operations |