AL HB45 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 10 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Briarwood Presbyterian Church, law enforcement officers with state police powers, employment authorized

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Briarwood Presbyterian Church, law enforcement officers with state police powers, employment authorized

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-10HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
2015-08-10HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-08-10HouseEnrolled
2015-08-10SenateSignature Requested
2015-08-10HousePassed Second House
2015-08-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 66
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-10SenateSanders motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-10SenateWaggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-08-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2015-08-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 29
2015-08-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback