AL HB449 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 2 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 2 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., (Birmingham Division and Bessemer Division) solicitor's fee, excluding municipal court of the City of Birmingham from collection of the fees, Act 2009-612, 2009 Reg Sess. am'd
Title
Jefferson Co., (Birmingham Division and Bessemer Division) solicitor's fee, excluding municipal court of the City of Birmingham from collection of the fees, Act 2009-612, 2009 Reg Sess. am'd
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Scott [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] | Sen. Merika Coleman-Evans [D] | Rep. Mary Moore [D] |
Rep. Juandalynn Givan [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 53 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 521 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |