AL HB446 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Transportation and Energy with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Utilities, governmental entities, prohibited from adopting or enforcing policies that prohibit the connection or reconnection of utility services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utilities, governmental entities, prohibited from adopting or enforcing policies that prohibit the connection or reconnection of utility services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 618 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 617 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 616 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenatePending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Transportation and Energy with 1 amendment
2021-04-08SenateTransportation and Energy first Amendment Offered
2021-04-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-04-01SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
2021-04-01HouseEngrossed
2021-04-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 618
2021-04-01HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 617
2021-04-01HouseFaulkner Amendment Offered
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-03-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-24HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB446&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB446-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB446-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/212556-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/212714-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42050.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42633.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42663.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654571&VOTE=616&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB446&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654608&VOTE=617&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=654610&VOTE=618&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback