AL HB445 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 51-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and offenses, crimes of riot and inciting to riot, harassment, and assault II, amended, crimes of assault against a first responder, aggravated riot, and unlawful traffic interference, created, mandatory holding period for certain violations, provided, mandatory incarceration period for certain violations, provided, exceptions to sovereign immunity, further provided, restrictions on distribution of revenue to defunding jurisdictions, provided, Secs. 13A-11-3.1, 13A-11-5.1, 13A-11-8.1 added; Secs. 12-25-32, 13A-6-21, 13A-6-132, 13A-11-1, 13A-11-3, 13A-11-4, 13A-11-8, 13A-11-70, 15-13-2, 36-1-12, 36-2-1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses, crimes of riot and inciting to riot, harassment, and assault II, amended, crimes of assault against a first responder, aggravated riot, and unlawful traffic interference, created, mandatory holding period for certain violations, provided, mandatory incarceration period for certain violations, provided, exceptions to sovereign immunity, further provided, restrictions on distribution of revenue to defunding jurisdictions, provided, Secs. 13A-11-3.1, 13A-11-5.1, 13A-11-8.1 added; Secs. 12-25-32, 13A-6-21, 13A-6-132, 13A-11-1, 13A-11-3, 13A-11-4, 13A-11-8, 13A-11-70, 15-13-2, 36-1-12, 36-2-1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 490 (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 489 (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 488 (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Rowe motion to Previous Question Roll Call 487 (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 486 (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2021-03-18HouseEngrossed
2021-03-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 490
2021-03-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 489
2021-03-18HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2021-03-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 488
2021-03-18HouseRowe motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 487
2021-03-18HouseJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-03-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2021-02-24HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
122532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A113.1New CodeSee Bill Text
13A114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A115.1New CodeSee Bill Text
13A1170Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A118.1New CodeSee Bill Text
13A6132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13A621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3621Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB445&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB445-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB445-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211817-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211941-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42174.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42400.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42416.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653245&VOTE=486&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB445&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653282&VOTE=487&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653283&VOTE=488&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653285&VOTE=489&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653286&VOTE=490&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback