AL HB444 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to Shelby County; to further provide for service of process in civil cases in Shelby County; to set an additional fee for civil service of process; to create the Shelby County Sheriff's Civil Service of Process Fund; to provide for the distribution of funds to the sheriff's civil service of process fund; and to authorize the sheriff to contract with or enter into an agreement with a private, public, or governmental entity for the purpose of service of process.
Title
Relating to Shelby County; to further provide for service of process in civil cases in Shelby County; to set an additional fee for civil service of process; to create the Shelby County Sheriff's Civil Service of Process Fund; to provide for the distribution of funds to the sheriff's civil service of process fund; and to authorize the sheriff to contract with or enter into an agreement with a private, public, or governmental entity for the purpose of service of process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 93 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-05-16 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 93 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-23 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-18 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Shelby County Legislation |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Shelby County Legislation |
2023-05-16 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-16 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-16 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-11 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported Favorably from House Shelby County Legislation |
2023-05-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Shelby County Legislation |
2023-05-09 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |